Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 828 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6228 Week
» 24280 Month
» 257200 Year
» 1922576 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8723 m/e 04/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6703
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal Mon 06/07/1964
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1931
16   Aberbeeg 4w/e 01/12/1945
CDF   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 10/07/1948
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 16/06/1962
88J   Aberdare 4w/e 09/02/1963
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
88J   Aberdare 4w/e 04/05/1963
     Withdrawn on 06/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABEEG Aberbeeg 4w/e 01/12/1945
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil m/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 04/05/1963
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8723
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6703
   
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (16)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
06/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 8723    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev