Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 25 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2100 Week
» 27461 Month
» 260381 Year
» 1925757 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8731 m/e 02/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2428
To Service During 02/1931
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962
Service Life 31 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1931
GLO   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 31/12/1949
85A   Worcester w/e 31/12/1950
85A   Worcester 4w/e 31/01/1951
85B   Gloucester Horton Road m/e 28/02/1951
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 31/03/1951
85C   Hereford 4w/e 30/04/1951
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1953
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 08/10/1955
81C   Southall 4w/e 03/12/1960
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 85A Worcester w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 85C Hereford m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8731
Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2428
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8731    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev