Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 834 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6234 Week
» 24286 Month
» 257206 Year
» 1922582 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 8736 m/e 04/1931

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder W.G. Bagnall
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2433
To Service During 04/1931
Withdrawal Tue 13/03/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1931
68   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/11/1945
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 21/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 13/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MYR   4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   m/e 31/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1931 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 8736
Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2433
   
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (68)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
13/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 8736    
05/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev