Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9011 |
24/08/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
55011 |
16/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
10/01/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
08/07/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/07/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/08/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/08/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/07/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/08/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/12/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9011 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2916 Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
20/05/1963 |
Naming |
Named 'THE ROYAL NORTHUMBERLAND FUSILIERS' at Newcastle Central station |
|
|
10/01/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/07/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55011 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
08/11/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55011 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/11/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|