Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 591 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3517 Week
» 5255 Month
» 132698 Year
» 1798074 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92018 on 31/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 31/10/1954 to Wellingborough (15A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/04/1967
Service Life 12 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
15A   Wellingborough (New) on 31/10/1954
14A   Cricklewood East 4w/e 28/12/1957
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 25/01/1958
17C   Rowsley w/e 24/03/1962
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/05/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 26/09/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/08/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/08/1966
WDN   w/e 22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92018
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Wellingborough (15A)
   
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
22/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92018    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev