Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92026 on 18/06/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 18/06/1955 to Wellingborough (15A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1967 off Speke Junction (8C)
Service Life 12 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
15A   Wellingborough (New) on 18/06/1955
21A   Saltley w/e 11/04/1961
15A   Wellingborough w/e 29/04/1961
15B   Kettering w/e 03/08/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/11/1963
9D   Newton Heath w/e 03/10/1964
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 22/05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15A Wellingborough w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1962 Crosti 9F Conversions Conversion of the ten former Franco-Crosti boilered Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 locos has been completed at Crewe Works and details, with a modification not previously recorded, are given below. Rebuilding began with 92026 in September, 1959. 92022 6/62, 92023 9/61. SLS/196210
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406
27/02/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. SLS/196604
27/03/1966 Crewe Works (Paint shop) Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92026
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Wellingborough (15A)
   
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
03/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
22/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
11/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92026 from Speke Junction (8C)    
04/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev