Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 549 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19460 Week
» 84414 Month
» 287078 Year
» 3313931 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92029 |
on |
09/07/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92029 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
13/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
11/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92029 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|