Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92050 on 20/08/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 20/08/1955 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/09/1967
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Buttigiegs (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
     Unknown - please contact administrator! 4w/e 13/08/1955
18A   Toton (New) on 20/08/1955
68A   Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 26/11/1955
18A   Toton 4w/e 31/12/1955
     Unknown - please contact administrator! 4w/e 23/03/1957
18A   Toton 4w/e 18/05/1957
21A   Saltley w/e 07/11/1959
17C   Rowsley w/e 21/11/1959
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/05/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
8C   Speke Junction w/e 05/02/1966
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 12/08/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 30/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 18A Toton w/e 20/08/1955
LOAN RTS RugbyTesting Station 4w/e 10/09/1955
LOAN 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 26/11/1955
LOAN MEEDerby   4w/e 03/12/1955
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 03/12/1955
EXLOAN 18A Toton 4w/e 31/12/1955
LOAN RTP   4w/e 23/03/1957
EXLOAN 18A Toton 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 12/08/1967
WDN   w/e 30/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
27/06/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. SLS/196508

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/08/1955 Allocation      
20/08/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92050
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
26/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
23/03/1957 Allocation      
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
30/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92050    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport    

prev prev