Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 549 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3475 Week
» 5213 Month
» 132656 Year
» 1798032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92051 on 27/08/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 27/08/1955 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/10/1967
Service Life 12 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
18A   Toton (New) on 27/08/1955
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 03/12/1955
18A   Toton 4w/e 31/12/1955
21A   Saltley 4w/e 16/06/1957
17C   Rowsley w/e 21/11/1959
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/05/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 04/12/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 21/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 18A Toton w/e 27/08/1955
LOAN 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 03/12/1955
EXLOAN 18A Toton 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 04/12/1965
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 21/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1960 9F News Having been on exhibition at Swindon Works, the last steam loco. to be constructed for B.R., 92220 Evening Star was exhibited at Bristol Temple Meads Station from 28-30/3/60, being later displayed at Cardiff Queen Street Station. Further examples of the class in the news were former Crosti-boilered 92025 of Wellingborough (15A) noted at Blackpool (24E) on 10/4/60, and 92051 of Rowsley (17C) recorded at Bidston Station on 25/4/60. SLS/196006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/08/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92051
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
21/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92051    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev