Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 16 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4643 Week
» 6381 Month
» 133824 Year
» 1799200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92052 on 27/08/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 27/08/1955 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/08/1967
Service Life 11 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1968 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
18A   Toton (New) on 27/08/1955
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 22/03/1958
21A   Saltley w/e 03/06/1961
18A   Toton w/e 17/06/1961
16D   Annesley w/e 07/10/1961
17C   Rowsley w/e 31/03/1962
18A   Toton w/e 14/04/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 13/07/1963
18A   Toton w/e 20/07/1963
15A   Wellingborough w/e 17/08/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 26/10/1963
9D   Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/06/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 12/08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 18A Toton w/e 27/08/1955
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 03/06/1961
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 16D Annesley 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 15A Leicester Midland 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/09/1961 Eastleigh MPD (71A) (Ex-Works) On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. SLS/196110
08/05/1966 Crewe Works (Traverser area) Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. SLS/196606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/08/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92052
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
03/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
31/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
13/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
17/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
26/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
12/08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92052    
01/1968 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev