Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92056 on 31/10/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 31/10/1955 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/11/1967 off Speke Junction (8C)
Service Life 12 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
18A   Toton (New) on 31/10/1955
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 22/03/1958
18A   Toton w/e 24/09/1960
21A   Saltley w/e 31/03/1962
15A   Wellingborough w/e 12/05/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 22/09/1962
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/05/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 24/10/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/08/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 11/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/08/1966
WDN 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92056
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
31/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
12/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
11/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92056 from Speke Junction (8C)    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev