Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 638 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14044 Week
» 67060 Month
» 186587 Year
» 3213440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92066 |
on |
31/12/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92066 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
24/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92066 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |
|
|