Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 556 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3482 Week
» 5220 Month
» 132663 Year
» 1798039 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92076 on 31/03/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 31/03/1956 to Doncaster (36A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/02/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
36A   Doncaster (New) on 31/03/1956
38B   Annesley 4w/e 16/03/1957
16J   Rowsley w/e 26/10/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/05/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 09/01/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 25/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 16J Rowsley 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 25/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop Yard) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203
21/03/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1675-D1681, D1842-D1850, 44685/91, 44717/77, 45347, 45446, 45589, 48151/208/423/557, 70002/9/17/41, 77014, 78028, 92009/76, D5702/3, D8064, D204/20/8/55/68/91, D375/99, D1506/9/16/9/26, D1684/6; Traverser area: D258, D317/28/72, D1521/5/82, D1689, D1717, E27004, 48170/312/615, 92013; Waiting Works: D324, D1517/50, 44800, 44829, 44905, 45006/327, 48077/124/97/364/87/93/433/632/49/66, 70032, 92017; Electric shop: E26015/44, E3011/5/6/20/2/56; Paint shop: D1669/70/1/3/4, D8004/54, E3007, 71000 (Stored); Outside: 44807, 45303, 48470, 48646, 92107, 92133, 92205, D213, D1510/39/76, D8037/49. Also noted: D2708/11/22/41/2/3 an D1734 ex Salop accident. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92076
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
26/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (16J)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
25/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92076    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev