Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 815 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14221 Week
» 67237 Month
» 186764 Year
» 3213617 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92095 |
on |
31/03/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92095 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92095 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|