|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/07/1961 | Crewe Works (Works Sidings) | Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. | SLS/196109 |
24/10/1965 | Derby shed (Stored) | New or ex-Works: D1702, D1911/2/3, D3083, D3590, 12022, D5299, D7561. Stored: 42165, 44932, 48170, 48510, 92096, 78000. | SLS/196512 |
28/11/1965 | Derby MPD (Stored) | Ex-Works D119, D1894, D1915/7/20, D2505, D3581, D3769. Stored-42165, 44932, 45262/89, 48083. 48170, 48510, 48666, 78000, 92096. | SLS/196601 |
02/01/1966 | Derby MPD (Stored) | ex Works: 12016/48, D2907, D3083, D3773, D5194, D7562; Stored: 42165, 44932, 45224, 48370, 92096, also ED2/4/5 and 10000/201-3. | SLS/196602 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/04/1957 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92096 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Annesley (38B) |
||
25/12/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (16C) | ||
15/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92096 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |