Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 599 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3525 Week
» 5263 Month
» 132706 Year
» 1798082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92110 on 27/10/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 27/10/1956 to Toton (18A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 11 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
18A   Toton (New) on 27/10/1956
14A   Cricklewood East 4w/e 01/12/1956
15A   Wellingborough w/e 18/04/1959
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 26/03/1960
26B   Agecroft w/e 10/02/1962
15A   Wellingborough w/e 14/07/1962
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 29/09/1962
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 23/11/1963
9D   Newton Heath w/e 26/09/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 18A Toton w/e 27/10/1956
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/05/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. SLS/196606
16/02/1968 CarnforthMPD (Out of use) Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. SLS/196803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/10/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92110
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Toton (18A)
   
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
22/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92110    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev