Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 565 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3491 Week
» 5229 Month
» 132672 Year
» 1798048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92114 on 30/11/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 30/11/1956 to Westhouses (18B)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/07/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Campbells (Airdrie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
18B   Westhouses (New) on 30/11/1956
18A   Toton w/e 18/06/1960
17C   Rowsley w/e 14/04/1962
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 02/05/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 26/09/1964
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 22/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 18B Westhouses w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 22/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92114
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Westhouses (18B)
   
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
22/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
22/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92114    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev