Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 516 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18319 Week
» 71335 Month
» 190862 Year
» 3217715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92130 |
on |
30/04/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
5w/e |
06/06/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/05/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92130 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
16/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
14/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92130 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|