Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 828 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18631 Week
» 71647 Month
» 191174 Year
» 3218027 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92145 |
on |
31/08/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
6w/e |
09/01/1965 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
06/11/1965 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
3w/e |
01/01/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92145 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92145 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|