03/05/1964 |
Doncaster Works (Stored) |
Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. |
SLS/196406 |
03/10/1964 |
Doncaster MPD (Stored on shed) |
Stored on shed: 60125/39/49, 90717, 92169/70/5. |
SLS/196411 |
13/12/1964 |
Doncaster MPD (Stored) |
Stored: 60139/49, 61212, 90469/717, 92169/70/5; Also on shed: 48755(1F), D1519/39/45/56, D1766. |
SLS/196501 |
10/01/1965 |
Doncaster MPD (Awaiting works or stored) |
Awaiting works or stored: 60114/128/157/8, 62037/40/51/5, 63906, 90302/469, 92169/70/5. |
SLS/196502 |
23/01/1965 |
Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) |
Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. |
SLS/196503 |
24/01/1965 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. |
SLS/196503 |