|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/05/1964 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. | SLS/196406 |
03/10/1964 | Doncaster MPD (Stored on shed) | Stored on shed: 60125/39/49, 90717, 92169/70/5. | SLS/196411 |
13/12/1964 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | Stored: 60139/49, 61212, 90469/717, 92169/70/5; Also on shed: 48755(1F), D1519/39/45/56, D1766. | SLS/196501 |
10/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Awaiting works or stored) | Awaiting works or stored: 60114/128/157/8, 62037/40/51/5, 63906, 90302/469, 92169/70/5. | SLS/196502 |
23/01/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) | Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/12/1957 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92170 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Doncaster (36A) |
||
31/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92170 | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |