Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 920 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18723 Week
» 71739 Month
» 191266 Year
» 3218119 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92186 |
on |
27/01/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92186 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
29/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92186 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|