Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1635 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15041 Week
» 68057 Month
» 187584 Year
» 3214437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92209 |
on |
26/06/1959 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
BR1G |
1516 |
26/06/1959 |
BR |
5,000g |
7t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92209 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) Tender fitted: BR1G Diagram BR9 boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92209 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|