Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4210 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17616 Week
» 70632 Month
» 190159 Year
» 3217012 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92217 |
on |
22/12/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
84C |
Banbury |
4w/e |
30/03/1963 |
ALLOC |
84C |
Banbury |
4w/e |
06/04/1963 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Tyseley |
5w/e |
12/10/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92217 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
30/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (2A) |
|
|
30/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92217 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|