Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1056 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18859 Week
» 71875 Month
» 191402 Year
» 3218255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92218 |
on |
18/01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92218 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
30/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92218 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|