31/03/1960 |
9F News |
Having been on exhibition at Swindon Works, the last steam loco. to be constructed for B.R., 92220 Evening Star was exhibited at Bristol Temple Meads Station from 28-30/3/60, being later displayed at Cardiff Queen Street Station. Further examples of the class in the news were former Crosti-boilered 92025 of Wellingborough (15A) noted at Blackpool (24E) on 10/4/60, and 92051 of Rowsley (17C) recorded at Bidston Station on 25/4/60. |
SLS/196006 |
31/03/1960 |
\"EVENING STAR\" - The First Three Months |
Canton (86C) took delivery of 92220 Evening Star from Swindon at the end of March. Its work in the first three months has followed a general pattern with some notable exceptions. Until the end of winter t.t. it regularly worked the 9-16 p.m. (5-20 p.m. Milford-Paddington) Fish from Cardiff to Swindon, returning in the night with another class 'C' freight. During this period it worked two passenger specials from Paddington. On the first day of the Summer t.t. (Mon, 13/6) Evening Star took up what looks like being its regular M-F Summer diagram: 10-30 a.m. Cardiff -Portsmouth (pass.) to Salisbury, 4-17 p.m. Salisbury-Bristol (pass.) (2-45 Portsmouth-Bristol), 10-50 p.m. Bristol (T.M.)-Cardiff class 'C' freight. Saturday, 18th June, however, saw 92220 on the 7-43 a.m: up relief to Paddington, returning with the 1.40 p.m. from Paddington to Cardiff; then on Mon. 27/6, the real excitement commenced when it was taken at the last moment to work up 'Red Dragon', 10-00 a.m. from Cardiff and returned on the diagram 3-55 p.m. down 'Capitals Limited' This was repeated on (28/6) and (1/7). Drivers' logs show 5 minutes early into Paddington, on 27 and (28/6) with the usual 13 - equals 450 tons and two or three signals and p.w. checks each day. Although on (1/7) the train was 17 minutes late into Padding-ton, there was a 10 minute late start from Cardiff and a whole string of checks and stops, the driver estimating a 15 minute gain on schedule to the engine. As under these conditions the 60 m.p.h. limit imposed on this class is asking too much of any keen driver the Shedmaster had reluctantly to put a ban on 92220 working to London and so it is back again on the Salisbury run. A typical week-end arrangement was Sat. 2/7, 8-05 a.m. Cardiff-Kingswear to Bristol, returning with the 7-40 a.m. Newton Abbott-Cardiff; Sun. 3/7, 12-45 a.m. to Swindon, with the Sat. 8-30 p.m. Whitland-Kensing-ton milk returning with the 4-10 a.m. Marston-Cardiff milk empties. The whole shed regard 92220 with pride and joy. |
SLS/196009 |
11/12/1966 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. |
SLS/196701 |
08/01/1967 |
Crewe Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. |
SLS/196702 |
19/02/1967 |
Crewe Works (New paint shop) |
Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. |
SLS/196704 |
18/06/1967 |
Crewe Works (New Paint shop) |
Erecting shop-E3005/12/47/57/60/9/78/97, E3121/39, E6101-7, D245, D258, D376/7, D1511/30, D1646/57/61/73, D1804/77/8/95, D8010; New shop-D221, D326, D1503/17/21, D1712/4/54, D1879, D5705, D8040/66; Works yard-D5703, 60026; Outside Paint shop-D230, D1537, D1640, E3118; Traverser area-D206, D240, D304, D342, D1508, D1514, D1642/77, D1747, D1846/7/50/4/9/63/70, D1972, D8004/46/67. Old cutting-up shop-D322; New Paint shop-E3074/96, E26014, 92220. Stored Works-D2708/11/9/22/41/2/3, D2900/01/2. |
SLS/196708 |
29/10/1967 |
Crewe Works (Inside Paint shop) |
Old Cutting up Shop-E3010/53. Outside Paint shop-E6101. Inside Paint shop-E6102/4, E3017/66/87, 92220. Traverser Area-D263/4/98, D1592, D1651/65, D1703/83, D1803/11/29/64/97, D1991, E6103. Old Boiler shop-D1108, D1500/6, D1741, D5701/8, D8008/35. Test Area-D243/84, D1528/78, D1670, D1899, D5705. Side of Works-D240, D349, D1639, D1862 (damaged), D1902, E3049, D8317/24. Erecting shop-E6105/6/7/8/9/10, D1518/36/40, D1658/67/75, D1830/44/96, D1905/95, D1917 (damaged), D235/80, D302/54, D398 (damaged), E26032/53, E3008/32/48/51/61, E3157/88/9. |
SLS/196712 |