Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2742 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16148 Week
» 69164 Month
» 188691 Year
» 3215544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92238 |
on |
22/09/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/10/1958 |
Newport Ebbw Junc. |
92237-40 from Pontypool Road are now here with 92241-4 (intended for Severn Tunnel Junc.). They work to Old Oak Common and also to Woodford (GC) via SMJ line. 92006 is stored. |
SLS/195812 |
29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92238 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
08/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
10/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92238 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|