Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1050 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18853 Week
» 71869 Month
» 191396 Year
» 3218249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92244 |
on |
28/11/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/12/1962 |
Cardiff East Dock MPD |
There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92244 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L) |
|
|
08/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92244 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|