Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 36 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4663 Week
» 6401 Month
» 133844 Year
» 1799220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D94 06/04/1961  
TOPS (45/1) 45114 14/09/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 45
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
45/006/04/1961
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Crewe Works
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Stone OK4625
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Split Headcode Box
No Gangway
To Service 06/04/1961 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawn 17/02/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 07/02/1994
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) on 06/04/1961
16E Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/08/1964
16D Nottingham w/e 21/11/1964
D16 Nottingham Division on 16/01/1965
D15 Leicester Division w/e 19/06/1965
41A Tinsley (on loan) w/e 07/01/1967
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 29/04/1967
D16 Nottingham Division on 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn on 17/02/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
09/1973   Dual Braked        

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
12/09/1963 Not severe   Mechanical seizures or failures Not known    


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 94
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
08/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
21/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Loaned to Tinsley (41A)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
09/1973 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
14/09/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 45114    
17/02/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 45114    
07/02/1994 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev