15/12/1963 |
Swindon Works (Triangle) |
Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. |
SLS/196401 |
26/04/1964 |
Swindon Works (Works Yard) |
Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. |
SLS/196406 |
20/09/1964 |
Swindon Works (Outside in works yard) |
On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. |
SLS/196410 |
11/10/1964 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 |
SLS/196411 |
20/12/1964 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
'A' Shop: D9525-9541, D603, D803/7/8/14, D820/7, D830, D853/9, D860/3/6, D1000/57, D3039, D3196, D3743/5/61, D3808/15, D3822, D6307/26/30/8/53, D7005/14, L95, 42975, 43003/12/112. Weigh House: D1037. 'C' Shop: 5257, 8401 remains. Triangle: 7023 in steam. Turntable area: 4659, 7782, 8405/9, 9425/57, 42945, 92223. Dump: 2818, 3685, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824, 6873, 7327, 8418, 9484, 9752, 78009. |
SLS/196502 |
14/02/1965 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
Erecting shop: D9532-46, 4079, D603, D800/1/25/53/66, D1019/34/48/69, D1746, D2238, D3105/96, D3260/8, D3355, D3604, D3750, D3947/80, D4016, PWM650. Weigh shop area: D807, D1017/38, D827, D4213, D6326/30, D7061. Dump: 2818, 3700/25, 3807/35, 5936/74, 6125, 6860, 6935. Triangle: 73093. Turntable area: 3253, 4659, 8405/9, 9425/57, 43003 ex Works. |
SLS/196503 |
09/05/1965 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
'A' Shop: D603, D800/16/8/35/41/52/6/67, D0280, D2124/42, D3003, D3582/93, D3774, D3809/17/21/30/40, D3965, D4010, D6310/7, D7015/8/21/4/37/51, D9543-9554; Turntable area: 8405, 9425/57; Weigh shop: D854. Dump: 2818, 6412, 6969; 'C' Shop: 7910 remains of. |
SLS/196506 |
03/10/1965 |
Swindon Works (Dump) |
Erecting shop: D811/2/3/29/58/65/70, D1003/6/20/51/5, D1589, D1742, D2141, D3034/5/91, D3108/80, D3258, D3743/4/56, D3847, D3954, D4118, D6304/10/7/35, D7000/9/23, D9500/54/5. WD 878 (350 h.p. shunter). 1442 for restoration. Weigh shop area: D603, D863, D1013/53, D2569; Triangle: D3998, 8459; Turntable area: D3953, D9521; Dump: 2818, 6412, 9425/57. Cutting up, shop: 8405 remains. |
SLS/196511 |