Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 737 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14780 Week
» 79734 Month
» 282398 Year
» 3309251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9446 |
on |
31/05/1951 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
ALLOC |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
3w/e |
29/06/1964 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
2w/e |
07/02/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
16/05/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9446 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7583 Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86F) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
07/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
07/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9446 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|