Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 793 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6193 Week
» 24245 Month
» 257165 Year
» 1922541 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9451 on 31/07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7588
To Service Fri 31/07/1951
Withdrawal Fri 13/07/1962
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 31/07/1951
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 11/08/1951
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 31/08/1951
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 13/08/1955
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1951
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1951 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9451
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7588
   
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
13/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 9451    
10/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev