Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 662 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14068 Week
» 67084 Month
» 186611 Year
» 3213464 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9480 |
on |
31/08/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9480 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7631 Allocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
30/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9480 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|