Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4189 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17595 Week
» 70611 Month
» 190138 Year
» 3216991 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9507 |
28/08/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/08/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9507 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9507 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
09/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Steel Corporation: at Corby |
|
|