Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4298 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17704 Week
» 70720 Month
» 190247 Year
» 3217100 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9528 |
21/01/1965 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9528 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
02/03/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9528 |
|
|
12/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Ashington |
|
|