Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 841 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6241 Week
» 24293 Month
» 257213 Year
» 1922589 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9631 on 18/12/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 355
To Service Wed 18/12/1945
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/12/1945
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/04/1949
BRY   Barry 4w/e 21/05/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/11/1958
87A   Neath (Court Sart) w/e 08/11/1964
87F   Llanelly 5w/e 16/05/1965
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1945
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   on 16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/12/1945 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9631
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9631    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev