Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17805 Week
» 70821 Month
» 190348 Year
» 3217201 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9632 |
on |
29/12/1945 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
355 |
To Service |
Fri 29/12/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/11/1964 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
29/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
2w/e |
13/04/1964 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
w/e |
08/07/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9632 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
06/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9632 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|