Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1528 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19331 Week
» 72347 Month
» 191874 Year
» 3218727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9641 |
on |
12/03/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
355 |
To Service |
Sat 12/03/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/10/1966 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/03/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9641 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southall (SHL) |
|
|
14/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9641 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|