Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 191 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3223 Week
» 21275 Month
» 254195 Year
» 1919571 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9649 on 04/06/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 356
To Service Wed 04/06/1946 to Tondu (TDU)
Withdrawal Wed 21/07/1965
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
TDU   Tondu (New) on 04/06/1946
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 02/11/1963
86B   Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 08/11/1964
     Withdrawn on 21/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1946 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9649
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Tondu (TDU)
   
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
21/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9649    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev