Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 206 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3238 Week
» 21290 Month
» 254210 Year
» 1919586 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9676 on 11/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 378
To Service Wed 11/03/1949
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/03/1949
BRY   Barry 4w/e 21/05/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/11/1958
88A   Cardiff East Dock 6w/e 12/10/1964
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CHYS Cardiff Cathays m/e 31/03/1949
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock w/e 12/10/1964
WDN   on 16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/03/1949 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9676
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9676    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev