|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/03/1949 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 9677 Built at Swindon Works |
||
07/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
20/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
06/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9677 | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |