Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 244 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3276 Week
» 21328 Month
» 254248 Year
» 1919624 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9679 on 11/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 378
To Service Fri 11/04/1949
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/04/1949
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 30/11/1957
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/11/1958
     Withdrawn on 06/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW CED Cardiff East Dock m/e 30/04/1949
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/04/1949 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9679
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
06/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9679    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev