Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 800 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70800 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3044 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63044 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90044 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25308
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Thu 01/12/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
66C   Hamilton (West) on 20/01/1950
66B   Motherwell w/e 04/03/1950
51B   Newport (Teeside) on 03/09/1950
51B   Newport (Teeside) 4w/e 23/09/1950
50A   York (North) 5w/e 24/07/1954
50D   Starbeck 3w/e 12/11/1955
53E   Goole w/e 19/09/1959
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 01/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 11/12/1945
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) on 20/01/1950
ALLOC 66B Motherwell w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 51B Newport (Teeside) on 03/09/1950
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 50D Starbeck 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 53E Goole 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 01/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 800
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25308
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70800    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3044    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63044 but not taken up    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90044    
20/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
04/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
03/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (50D)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (53E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
01/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90044    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev