Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 818 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2499 Week
» 22792 Month
» 200696 Year
» 1866072 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 801 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70801 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90312 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25309
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/12/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
MC   Melton Constable 4w/e 21/04/1951
84C   Banbury 3w/e 19/05/1951
81F   Oxford 4w/e 01/11/1952
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 08/09/1956
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1956
81C   Southall 4w/e 26/03/1960
81E   Didcot 4w/e 25/03/1961
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 20/05/1961
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 07/10/1961
9G   Gorton on 20/05/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 21/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 82C Swindon m/e 31/03/1950
ALLOC MC Melton Constable 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 25/03/1961
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   w/e 21/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 801
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25309
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70801    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (MC)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
01/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90312    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
20/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
21/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90312    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev