Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 852 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4365 Week
» 24658 Month
» 202562 Year
» 1867938 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 802 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70802 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90313 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25310
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 14/07/1951
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 11/08/1951
65A   Eastfield 8w/e 09/09/1951
84C   Banbury 4w/e 31/12/1951
84C   Banbury w/e 09/02/1952
84C   Banbury 4w/e 29/02/1952
81C   Southall 4w/e 24/04/1954
84C   Banbury 4w/e 19/04/1958
41F   Mexborough on 02/12/1962
41D   Canklow w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 25/08/1947
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 84C Banbury w/e 09/02/1952
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41D Canklow 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   on 25/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910
31/12/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. SLS/195002
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104
21/08/1963 Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 802
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25310
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70802    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90313    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
09/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90313    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield    

prev prev