Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 780 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2461 Week
» 22754 Month
» 200658 Year
» 1866034 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 804 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70804 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3045 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63045 w/e 26/06/1948
British Railways 90045 on 03/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25312
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Wed 27/10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
NPT   Newport (Teeside) w/e 12/02/1949
54D   Consett 4w/e 18/04/1953
54B   Tyne Dock 4w/e 19/02/1955
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 20/07/1957
50A   York (North) w/e 12/12/1959
     Withdrawn on 27/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HLS Hull Springhead on 12/03/1946
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 27/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 804
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25312
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70804    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3045    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63045    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
03/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90045    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (54D)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
27/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90045    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev