Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 841 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4354 Week
» 24647 Month
» 202551 Year
» 1867927 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 807 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70807 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90314 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25315
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
     Withdrawn w/e 24/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 30/09/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 05/02/1949
WDN   w/e 24/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 807
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25315
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70807    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90314    
24/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90314    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev