Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 848 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2529 Week
» 22822 Month
» 200726 Year
» 1866102 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 808 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70808 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90315 m/e 10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25316
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 21/11/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 15/07/1950
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 29/12/1951
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 31/01/1952
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
85E   Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 23/04/1960
84C   Banbury 4w/e 18/06/1960
8B   Warrington Dallam on 30/08/1962
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 19/01/1963
26B   Agecroft w/e 24/08/1963
9K   Bolton w/e 14/09/1963
9J   Agecroft w/e 18/07/1964
36C   Frodingham w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 21/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CNYD Croes Newydd m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 21/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 808
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25316
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70808    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
10/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90315    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85E)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
30/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
24/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
21/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90315    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev