Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2443 Week
» 22736 Month
» 200640 Year
» 1866016 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 809 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70809 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90316 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25317
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/12/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
25G   Farnley Junction (Reinstated) (from store on WR) 3w/e 14/01/1950
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 04/10/1952
26C   Bolton 4w/e 18/04/1953
26F   Belle Vue 4w/e 08/10/1955
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
27B   Aintree w/e 10/01/1959
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 17/06/1961
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 12/01/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 18/01/1964
9K   Bolton w/e 15/02/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 29/02/1964
40E   Colwick w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 26/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 8L Aintree 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 26/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 W.D. \"Austerity\" 2-8-0\'s Position as at 31/12/47: By 31/12/47 the 700 W.D. 2-8-0's allocated to the Brtish Railways had all arrived in this country. The L.N.E.R. have their full 478 (i.e. original allocation of 410 plus 68 additional, vice 68 '0.6's' to the L.M.S.), and the Southern have their 50. The G.W.R. have 165 out of their total allocation of 172, the other 7 being at Harwich. The seven at Harwich are:-Nos. 70809, 70814, 70838, 70864, 77054, 78595, 79214. Of the 165 shown as 'on the G.W.R. system,' 89 are in traffic and the other 76 at Kingham and Marston. These 76 are officially classified as 'stabled awaiting heavy repair,' although it is believed that some of them have already been repaired in Belgium. The table below illustrates the final stages of the movement of W.D. 2-8-0's. TABLE REQUIRED HERE: Allocation On System 20/11/47 On System 18/12/47 On System 31/12/47 G.W.R. 172 157 161 165 L.N.E.R. 478 477 478 478 S.R. 50 50 50 50 Harwich 2 5 *7 Total in U.K. 700 686 694 700*For Western Region SLS/194804
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 809
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25317
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70809    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90316    
14/01/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26F)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
26/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90316    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev