Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 852 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4365 Week
» 24658 Month
» 202562 Year
» 1867938 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 810 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 70810 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3046 on 13/04/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63046 on Not applied
British Railways 90046 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25318
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/03/1963
Service Life 19 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
18B   Westhouses w/e 08/10/1960
9G   Gorton w/e 30/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 23/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 18B Westhouses 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 23/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 810
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25318
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 70810    
13/04/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3046    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63046 but not taken up    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90046    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
23/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90046    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev